FL S1540 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that the rental and purchase of durable medical equipment and complex rehabilitation technology by providers of home health care services or medical supplies and appliances be reimbursed by the Agency for Health Care Administration, managed care plans, and subcontractors at a specified amount; requiring that Medicaid enrollees be allowed their choice of certain qualified Medicaid providers; prohibiting a managed care plan from referring its members to a subcontractor for covered services if the subcontractor has an ownership interest or a profit-sharing arrangement with certain entities, etc.
Title
Medicaid Managed Care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1165 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 967 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1540 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1540/BillText/Filed/HTML |