FL S1538 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the Renewable Energy Jobs Assistance Program within the Department of Economic Opportunity; providing a purpose for the program; requiring the department to establish an application process for grants awarded and loans made under the program; requiring the department to determine the need for workers in specific areas of the renewable energy industry and to award grants or make loans based on that determination, etc.
Title
Employment in the Renewable Energy Industry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1538 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1538/BillText/Filed/HTML |