FL S1516 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the manner in which presidential electors are elected; requiring the Governor to designate at large electors and electors who represent the respective Congressional districts, as recommended by the state executive committee of the respective political parties; specifying how presidential electors must cast their ballots; requiring the state executive committee of a political party to provide by resolution a selection method for presidential electors, etc.
Title
Presidential Electors
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Evers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Rules |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0075 (Similar To) 2014-01-16 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H1045 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee
H1045 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
103 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
103 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
103 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
103 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1516 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1516/BillText/Filed/HTML |