FL S1512 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the phrase "enforcing the Florida Building Code" to include certain costs; revising specified activities that, unless otherwise provided by law, may not be funded with fees adopted for enforcing the code, etc.
Title
Fees for Enforcing the Florida Building Code
Sponsors
Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/09/19, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1512 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1512/BillText/Filed/HTML |