FL S1508 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-62
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from knowingly selling, exchanging, or transferring a police vehicle without removing any police markings from the vehicle; requiring law enforcement agencies to provide an official letter of notification that the police markings have been removed; exempting sales, exchanges, or transfers of police vehicles to members of the public for the purposes of collection or display from specified requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Police Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#733 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22 Chapter No. 2020-62
2020-06-20 Approved by Governor
2020-06-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-12SenateOrdered enrolled
2020-03-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2020-03-11HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-09HouseReceived
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-09HouseIn Messages
2020-03-09SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-09SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20
2020-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-26SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-19SenateCS/CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-02-19SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-19SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-17SenateCS/CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/17/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-12SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Infrastructure and Security
2020-02-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Infrastructure and Security; Rules
2020-01-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1281 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 1508 passed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31914Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback