FL S1504 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes an amendment to the State Constitution to redesignate the Department of Elderly Affairs as the Department of Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Elder Affairs [SPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules -SJ 00106
2010-02-03 Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2010-01-27 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0015 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00412Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback