FL S1500 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 6033
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Removing the scheduled repeal of provisions governing the commission's direct-support organization, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Direct-support Organization of the Florida Commission on Community Service

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 6033
2018-03-05SenateSubstituted HB 6033
2018-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/18
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/18, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-22SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-22SenateFavorable by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/15/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-01-30SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-30SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/30/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations; Rules
2018-01-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6033 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-73
S1110 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1429Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback