FL S1498 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing Medicaid to reimburse for dental services provided in a mobile dental unit that is owned by, operated by, or contracted with a health access setting or another similar program; requiring the chair of the Board of Dentistry to appoint a Council on Dental Therapy; requiring a practitioner of dental therapy to post and display her or his license in each office where she or he practices; authorizing a dental therapist to perform specified services under the general supervision of a dentist with authorization and within the terms of a written collaborative management agreement if certain criteria are met, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dental Therapy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Health Policy
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2018-01-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H683 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
409906Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4660075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4660136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4660225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4660226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4660227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466028Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4660285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466051Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback