FL S1492 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising duties and responsibilities of the Agency for Health Care Administration relating to issuance of licenses to health care facilities and health service providers; revising health-care-related projects subject to agency review for a certificate of need and exemptions therefrom; deleting certificate-of-need requirements for osteopathic acute care hospitals, etc.
Title
Certificates of Need for Hospitals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations; Rules |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H27 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
H597 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 622
S622 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-24
H597 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 622
S622 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-24
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
395 | 1055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 6025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 0361 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 039 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1492 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1492/BillText/Filed/HTML |