FL S1490 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the giving, solicitation, and acceptance of gifts or compensation to be used toward costs incurred due to a serious bodily injury or the diagnosis of a serious disease or illness of specified reporting individuals, procurement employees, or spouse or child thereof, who meet certain conditions; revising provisions regarding prohibited lobbying expenditures in the legislative and executive branches, respectively, to conform to changes made by the act, etc.
Title
Public Officers and Employees
Sponsors
Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Sen. Rob Bradley [R] | Sen. Douglas Broxson [R] | Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
Sen. Randolph Bracy [D] | Sen. Kevin Rader [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#34 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Messages |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-05 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-05 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (286166) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-04 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/03/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 01/21/20, 4:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1435 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3148 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |