FL S1490 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "first responder," for purposes of the tax exemption, to include law enforcement officers and firefighters who sustained a total and permanent disability in the line of duty while serving as full-time paid employees in another state, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

First Responder Property Tax Exemption

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Finance and Tax
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-20SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2019-03-20SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/20/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-02-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6035 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
196102Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback