FL S1486 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the "Healthy Florida Act"; creating the Healthy Florida program, to be administered by the Healthy Florida Board; creating the Healthy Florida Board; specifying powers and duties of the board in establishing and implementing comprehensive universal single-payer health care coverage and a health care cost control system for the benefit of state residents; prohibiting law enforcement agencies from using Healthy Florida moneys, facilities, property, equipment, or personnel for certain purposes; providing that every resident of this state is eligible and entitled to enroll under the Healthy Florida program, etc.
Title
Health Care Coverage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H697 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
H699 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
H701 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
H699 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
H701 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
408 | 95 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 951 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 953 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 954 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 955 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 956 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 957 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 958 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 96 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 961 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 962 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 963 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 964 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 97 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 98 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 99 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1486 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1486/BillText/Filed/HTML |