FL S1484 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Redefining the term "line-make vehicle"; revising a prohibition against certain applicants and licensees competing with franchised motor vehicle dealers in this state, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Manufacturers and Dealers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Rules
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-26SenateCS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2020-02-21SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-20SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-19SenateCS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
2020-02-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/19/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-13SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Judiciary
2020-02-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-10SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Judiciary; Rules
2020-01-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1383 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32064Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback