FL S1480 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of State to create and maintain a centralized public database of county, municipal, and special district charters and amendments; requiring all counties, municipalities, and special districts to file, by specified dates, electronic copies of their charters and amendments with the department, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Centralized Database for Public Charters and Amendments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Community Affairs
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2018-01-03SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12560Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12582Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
166031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
189013Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback