FL S1478 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting points from being assessed for violations of community sanctions which are resolved under an alternative sanctioning program for purposes of calculations under the Criminal Punishment Code; providing for the resolution of low-risk violations of probation through an alternative sanctioning program in certain circumstances; requiring the court to release the probationer or offender without bail under certain conditions; authorizing the court to impose nonmonetary conditions of release under certain conditions, etc.
Title
Criminal Sentencing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#446 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#53 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#446 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#53 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2023-06-26 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2023-05-03 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (224833) |
2023-05-03 | Senate | In returning messages |
2023-05-03 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2023-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Amendment 199509 superseded by substitute |
2023-05-02 | House | Amendment 224833 adopted |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-01 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2023-05-01 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023) |
2023-05-01 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | In Messages |
2023-04-28 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (185804) |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2023-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/04/23, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1263 (Same As) 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
921 | 0024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |