FL S1474 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a seller of real property to disclose certain flood information to a prospective purchaser before executing a contract for the sale of the property, etc.
Title
Required Flood Disclosures for Real Property Sales
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1474 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1474/BillText/Filed/HTML |