FL S1472 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the K-20 education performance accountability system to comply with the ESEA, as amended by the ESSA, instead of the "No Child Left Behind Act of 2001"; deleting a requirement for the State Board of Education to comply with the ESEA flexibility waiver, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-26SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-03-26SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/26/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-02-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7055 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002451Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100485Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100831Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100833Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1008332Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100834Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101256Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback