FL S1470 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, in consultation with the Department of Environmental Protection, to establish by rule a compliance market for carbon emissions to facilitate carbon credit trading for agricultural producers in the state; authorizing the department to contract with public and private entities to administer the market, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carbon Dioxide Compliance and Credit Market for Agricultural Producers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05SenateDied in Agriculture
2023-03-14SenateIntroduced
2023-03-09SenateReferred to Agriculture; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
2023-03-02SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
570234Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback