FL S1470 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising requirements for the annual reports that charter school sponsors are required to submit to the Department of Education; requiring the Charter School Appeal Commission, which is renamed the Charter School Commission, to recommend denial of a charter school application if the school does not propose a certain reading curriculum; specifying the entities from which the commission may receive and consider applications; requiring the commission to submit recommendations for approval of charter school applications to the state board, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charter Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/16/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-02SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2019-03-28SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-03-27SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-26SenateCS by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
2019-03-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/26/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-02-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7095 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback