FL S1470 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 207 (Ch. 2017-49)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 207 (Ch. 2017-49)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting an agency from offering a bonus on work performance in an inspector general contract or agreement; prohibiting the Florida Housing Finance Corporation from offering a bonus on work performance in an inspector general contract or agreement, etc.
Title
Agency Inspectors General
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 207 (Ch. 2017-49) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Substituted HB 207 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/17 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/25/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/03/17, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/27/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Rules |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H207 (Similar To) 2017-06-02 - Chapter No. 2017-49
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1470 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1470/BillText/Filed/HTML |