FL S1464 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the annual appropriation of a specified amount to the Division of Arts and Culture to fund grants to acquire, renovate, or construct cultural facilities; requiring an annual appropriation of a specified amount to the Historical Preservation Grant Program to fund grants to assist with the preservation of historic properties, etc.
Title
Cultural and Historical Grant Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
265 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
267 | 0617 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1464 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1464/BillText/Filed/HTML |