FL S1458 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to develop surveys to assess patient-safety culture in certain health care facilities; requiring the submission of patient-safety culture survey data as a condition of licensure, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patient-safety Culture Surveys

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Health Policy
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2018-01-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H35 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408810Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback