FL S1454 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Florida Strategic Fuel Reserve Task Force adjunct to the Division of Emergency Management to develop a recommended strategic fuel reserve plan for an emergency or a disaster; requiring the division to provide administrative and support services to the task force; requiring the task force to elect a chair and a vice chair; requiring the task force to submit a report to the Governor and the Legislature by a specified date, etc.
Title
Strategic Fuel Reserve
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1454 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1454/BillText/Filed/HTML |