FL S1454 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Directing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to develop a Highwaymen license plate; providing for distribution and use of fees collected from the sale of the plates, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specialty License Plates/Highwaymen

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-06SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-02-06SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2020-02-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-03SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2020-01-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1456 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
H385 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
H387 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Ordered enrolled
S412 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1135
H1135 (Similar To) 2020-03-13 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback