FL S1454 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a public school employee or volunteer from providing certain materials to minors; requiring a school principal to notify certain parents of the inclusion of sex education instructional materials in a course; requiring district school boards to make certain information relating to instructional materials available to the public; revising the requirements for the district school board instructional materials review process, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Instructional Materials

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Education
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Education; Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations
2019-02-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H855 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100342Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100628Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1006283Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100631Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100634Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100640Amended CodeSee Bill Text
847001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
847012Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback