FL S1454 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Deleting the cash build-up factor in the formula used for determining insurer reimbursement premiums paid to the fund, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-20SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2018-02-20SenateFavorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 3
2018-02-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/20/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2018-01-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H97 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
215555Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627351Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback