FL S1450 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising requirements for the administration of and participation in the Healthy Food Financing Initiative program; providing program eligibility requirements for nonprofit organizations and revising eligibility requirements for community development financial institutions; revising requirements for program applicants and projects; requiring the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability to review the program and collected data and provide the Legislature with a specified report, etc.
Title
Healthy Food Financing Initiative Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Agriculture (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Agriculture (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/22/22, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/19/22, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1311 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
500 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
595 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |