FL S1448 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting from the sales and use tax specified items that enable elderly persons to age in place and live independently in their homes or residences, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Exemptions for the Elderly

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-23SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
2018-01-22SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/22/18, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2018-01-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1123 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ways and Means Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback