FL S1446 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Homeowner Protection and Empowerment Act"; revising the form required for a written demand to participate in presuit mediation; requiring nonbinding arbitration in certain homeowners' association disputes; requiring that a judicial proceeding be initiated within a specified timeframe after the entry of an arbitrator's final decision; authorizing parties in certain disputes to either file a dispute in court or elect to enter into binding or nonbinding arbitration, etc.
Title
Homeowners' Associations Dispute Resolution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1448 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H233 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
H235 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
H233 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
H235 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1446 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1446/BillText/Filed/HTML |