FL S1446 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Emergency Power Systems Matching Grant Program"; requiring the Department of Health to establish and administer the Emergency Power Systems Matching Grant Program to provide state matching funds to certain public and private health care facilities for specified years on a first-come, first-served basis, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Power Systems Matching Grant Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Health Policy
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations; Rules
2018-01-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H435 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback