FL S1444 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Prescription Drug Cost Reduction Act"; providing that pharmacy benefit managers have a fiduciary duty and obligation to specified individuals and entities; requiring group health plans, health insurers, and certain pharmacy benefit managers to base plan beneficiaries' and insureds' coinsurance obligations for certain prescription drugs on specified drug prices; providing circumstances under which contracts between health insurers or health maintenance organizations and pharmacy benefit managers are void and against the public policy, etc.
Title
Prescription Drug Benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H961 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
S1682 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S1682 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 9201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 0156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 0197 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 1901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 490 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 42385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 64741 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6572 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 314 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1444 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1444/BillText/Filed/HTML |