FL S1442 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the purpose of the program; expanding eligibility criteria for the program to include certain practice areas; requiring practitioners to provide specified proof of eligibility to receive payments under the program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Education Reimbursement and Loan Repayment Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18SenateIntroduced
2022-01-12SenateReferred to Health Policy; Education; Rules
2022-01-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H657 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100965Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback