FL S1442 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Community Recall Act"; revising the process for recalling a director of a homeowners' association; requiring a specified percentage of certain parcel owners to initiate a recall petition or a special meeting to recall a director; requiring the board of directors to duly notice and hold a referendum within a specified time, etc.
Title
Homeowners' Association Recalls
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Community Affairs; Rules |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H137 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1442 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1442/BillText/Filed/HTML |