FL S1442 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 221 (Ch. 2016-222), CS/CS/HB 1175 (Ch. 2016-234)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 221 (Ch. 2016-222), CS/CS/HB 1175 (Ch. 2016-234)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring hospitals, ambulatory surgical centers, specialty hospitals, and urgent care centers to comply with certain provisions as a condition of licensure; requiring a hospital to post on its website certain information regarding health insurers, health maintenance organizations, health care practitioners, and practice groups that it contracts with, and a specified disclosure statement; providing additional acts that constitute grounds for denial of a license or disciplinary action to which penalties apply, etc.
Title
Out-of-network Health Insurance Coverage
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Banking and Insurance Committee | Senate Health Policy Committee | Sen. Rene Garcia [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 221 (Ch. 2016-222), CS/CS/HB 1175 (Ch. 2016-234) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 221 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) reconsidered, withdrawn (158798) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (158798, 877178) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/16 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/25/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-18 | Senate | CS/CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | CS/CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/16/16, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Now in Banking and Insurance |
2016-02-02 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 5 NAYS 4 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/01/16, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0221 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-222, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224), CS/CS/HB 1175 (Ch. 2016-234)
H1175 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-234, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 221 (Ch. 2016-222)
S1496 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1175 (Ch. 2016-234), CS/CS/CS/HB 221 (Ch. 2016-222)
H1175 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-234, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 221 (Ch. 2016-222)
S1496 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1175 (Ch. 2016-234), CS/CS/CS/HB 221 (Ch. 2016-222)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
395 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 7057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 64194 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6471 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 662 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 513 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |