FL S1438 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the Inland Protection Trust Fund to be used for the cleanup of drycleaning solvents under the drycleaning solvent cleanup program; revising the sources of funds for the drycleaning solvent cleanup program; requiring the Department of Environmental Protection to have a specified number of individual contractors participating in the program by a specified date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Inland Protection

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations
2018-01-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1075 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3763071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3763078Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback