FL S1436 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Florida Statewide Water Oversight and Planning Council within the Department of Environmental Protection to guide and assist water forecasting plans for the state, etc.
Title
Water Supply Planning and Oversight
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1073 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1436 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1436/BillText/Filed/HTML |