FL S1432 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a landfill in this state from receiving fossil fuel combustion products, etc.
Title
Fossil Fuel Combustion Products in Landfills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Environment and Natural Resources |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Rules |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
403 | 7047 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1432 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1432/BillText/Filed/HTML |