FL S1426 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing construction relating to when a transaction is properly characterized as an exempt sale or lease to a governmental entity, etc.
Title
Sales Tax Exemptions for Governmental Entities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from further consideration |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1426 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1426/BillText/Filed/HTML |