FL S1424 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the number of directors allowed on the boards of special neighborhood improvement districts; requiring local planning ordinances to specify the number of directors and provide for 4-year staggered terms; requiring that directors be landowners in the proposed area and be subject to certain taxation, etc.
Title
Special Neighborhood Improvement Districts
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 1009 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Substituted HB 1009 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/20 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Favorable by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 02/17/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Now in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1009 (Same As) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-86
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1424 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1424/BillText/Filed/HTML |