FL S1424 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that electronic service be made only by certain authorized individuals; authorizing certain persons to electronically sign return-of-service forms; requiring that such electronic service by publication be made only in certain circumstances by certain authorized individuals, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Service of Process

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateDied in Judiciary
2017-05-05SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-15SenateIntroduced
2017-03-14SenateReferred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Rules
2017-03-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H511 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
48021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
48031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
48062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4827Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4913Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback