FL S1416 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 90 (Ch. 2021-11)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 90 (Ch. 2021-11)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a person seeking to qualify for office as a candidate with no party affiliation to state that he or she is registered without party affiliation and has not been a registered member of a political party for a specified period of time before qualifying, as a condition of qualifying, etc.
Title
No Party Affiliation Candidates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 90 (Ch. 2021-11) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H457 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
S830 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 90 (Ch. 2021-11)
S90 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Chapter No. 2021-11
S830 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 90 (Ch. 2021-11)
S90 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Chapter No. 2021-11
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
99 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
99 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
99 | 0955 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1416 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1416/BillText/Filed/HTML |