FL S1416 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Hearing: Jan 28 @ 1:30 pm in 37 Senate Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring public transit providers to post a specified sign concerning assaulting a transit operator; requiring public transit providers to create and implement a risk reduction program; revising the reclassification of the offense of assault on specified persons, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assaults on Specified Persons

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2020-01-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H951 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3410611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78407Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback