FL S1412 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Florida Internship Tax Credit Program"; providing a credit against the corporate income tax to a taxpayer employing a degree-seeking student intern if certain criteria are met; specifying the amount of the credit; specifying a limit on the credit claimed per taxable year, etc.
Title
Internship Tax Credit Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Finance and Tax |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/17/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Education; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H357 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H439 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S642 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H1101 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
H439 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S642 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H1101 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1412 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1412/BillText/Filed/HTML |