FL S1400 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1159 (Ch. 2019-155)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Deleting a provision that authorizes electric utilities to perform certain right-of-way tree maintenance only if a property owner has received local government approval; prohibiting certain local government ordinances or regulations from requiring a permit, application, notice, fee, or fine for certain activities regarding trees on residential property; establishing a property owner bill of rights; requiring each county property appraiser office to provide information regarding the property owner bill of rights on the appraiser's website, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private Property Rights

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1159 (Ch. 2019-155)
2019-04-26SenateSubstituted CS/HB 1159
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-25SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-23SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-10SenateCS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2019-04-10SenateNow in Rules
2019-04-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-08SenateCS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-04-03SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2019-04-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/08/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-03SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-04-03SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-02SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/02/19, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2019-02-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1159 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-155

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633214Amended CodeSee Bill Text
715015Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback