FL S1400 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

(THIS BILL COMBINES S1400 & 1640) Creating the "Florida Vacation Rental Act"; preempting certain regulation and control of vacation rentals to the state; specifying authority of the Division of Hotels and Restaurants over regulation of vacation rentals; requiring vacation rentals to obtain a license; specifying that vacation rentals are to be treated as transient rentals regarding certain landlord and tenant provisions; requiring the division to inspect vacation rentals when necessary to respond to emergencies and epidemiological conditions; grandfathering certain local laws, ordinances, and regulations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vacation Rentals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-14SenateCS/CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
2018-02-14SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-09SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-08SenateCS/CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2018-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/08/18, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-01SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2018-02-01SenateNow in Regulated Industries
2018-02-01SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-30SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 2
2018-01-30SenateCS combines this bill with SB 1640
2018-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/30/18, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Regulated Industries; Appropriations
2017-12-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H773 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15927Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
404056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509092Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509144Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5092015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5092112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509281Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5094005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509417Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509601Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5096051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509608Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5535041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7171355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
87724Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback