FL S1398 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1185 (Ch. 2023-130), CS/CS/CS/SB 418 (Ch. 2023-217)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Defining the term "remote location"; authorizing a licensee under ch. 494, F.S., to allow loan originators to work from remote locations if specified conditions are met; providing requirements for crowd-funding platforms and organizers of crowd-funding campaigns related to and arising out of declared disasters; specifying restrictions on public adjusters contracting their adjuster services after a specified date; revising the definition of the term "hurricane," and defining the term "hurricane deductible," as used in policies providing residential coverage; deleting a debt obligation rating requirement for certain service warranty associations or parent corporations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Protection

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1185 (Ch. 2023-130), CS/CS/CS/SB 418 (Ch. 2023-217)
2023-05-01SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 1185
2023-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2023-04-28SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2023-04-26SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
2023-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2023-04-25SenateCS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time
2023-04-25SenateFavorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2023-04-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2023-04-20SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2023-04-20SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2023-04-18SenateCS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2023-04-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/18/23, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2023-03-28SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2023-03-24SenateNow in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2023-03-24SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2023-03-22SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 1
2023-03-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2023-03-14SenateIntroduced
2023-03-09SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
2023-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1185 (Similar To) 2023-05-25 - Chapter No. 2023-130; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 418 (Ch. 2023-217)
S418 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-217, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1185 (Ch. 2023-130)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
494001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4940067Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5012042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
52023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
560111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
560309Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626854Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626860Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626875Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6268796Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6268797Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269541Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6274025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6274133Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6274554Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62770132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
634041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
634401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
634406Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1398
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1398/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1398/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1398/BillText/c2/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1398/Amendment/533280/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1398/Amendment/112766/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1398/Analyses/2023s01398.pre.bi.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1398/Analyses/2023s01398.bi.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1398/Analyses/2023s01398.pre.aeg.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1398/Analyses/2023s01398.aeg.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1398/Analyses/2023s01398.pre.fp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1398/Analyses/2023s01398.fp.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1398/Vote/2023-03-22%201100AM~S01398%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1398/Vote/2023-04-18%201200PM~S01398%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1398/Vote/2023-04-25%201000AM~S01398%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback