FL S1394 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating an exemption from public records requirements for the personal identifying information of adults who participate in a prearrest diversion program; providing for future review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Prearrest Diversion Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/22/18, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-12-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1392 (Related) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-127
H1199 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H1197 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1392

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
90140Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback