FL S1392 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-127
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Corrections to include information in its annual report on inmate admission based on offense type and recidivism rate; encouraging local communities and public or private educational institutions to implement prearrest diversion programs for certain offenders; requiring each pretrial release program to include in its annual report the types of criminal charges of defendants accepted into a pretrial release program, the number of defendants accepted into a pretrial release program who paid a bail or bond, the number of defendants accepted into a pretrial release program with no prior criminal conviction, and the number of defendants for whom a pretrial risk assessment tool was used or was not, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Justice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#64 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#872 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02 Chapter No. 2018-127
2018-03-30 Approved by Governor
2018-03-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2018-03-09SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 1
2018-03-09SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (299739)
2018-03-08SenateIn returning messages
2018-03-07HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2018-03-07HouseAmendment(s) adopted (307641) 1064
2018-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-06HouseAmendment(s) adopted (711177) 1016
2018-03-06HouseSubstituted for CS/CS/HB 1197
2018-03-06HouseRead 2nd time 1015
2018-03-05HouseReceived
2018-03-05HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
2018-03-05HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-03-02HouseIn Messages
2018-03-02SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2018-03-02SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-01SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-28SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/18
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-28SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-27SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 1
2018-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-15SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/14/18, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-26SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-01-23SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-23SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-22SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/22/18, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-12-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1394 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
H489 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S644 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
H1197 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1392
H1199 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H7071 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1218 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90140Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
907043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430582Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943687Amended CodeSee Bill Text
945041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985126Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985145Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Amendment/445982/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Amendment/699198/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Amendment/148362/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Amendment/413792/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Amendment/711177/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Amendment/307641/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Amendment/299739/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Amendment/601794/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Amendment/105606/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Amendment/108708/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Amendment/761362/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Amendment/681172/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Amendment/835972/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Amendment/232802/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Amendment/379686/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Amendment/932166/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Amendment/221438/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Amendment/793706/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Vote/SenateVote_s01392c2012.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Vote/HouseVote_s01392c2872.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1392/Vote/SenateVote_s01392c2064.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback