FL S1390 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Office of Regulatory Relief within the Department of Economic Opportunity; creating the General Regulatory Sandbox Program; providing requirements for applications; requiring the office to consult with specified entities before admitting an applicant into the regulatory sandbox; specifying limits to such exemption; authorizing the office to terminate participation in the regulatory sandbox, etc.
Title
Universal Regulatory Sandbox
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/20/23, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1392 (Related) 2023-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
H1287 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
H1289 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
H1287 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
H1289 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 9981 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9974 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9976 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9977 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9978 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9979 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9982 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9983 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |