FL S1390 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising requirements related to the disclosure of certain adoption-related records without a court order; deleting the ability for certain adoption-related records to be disclosed without a court order; deleting a required fee for certain services and expenses; authorizing a court to break the seal of specified birth records upon the request of the person whose birth is the subject of such records under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Release of Adoption Information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18SenateIntroduced
2022-01-12SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2021-12-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1369 (Same As) 2022-01-14 - Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
382015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63162Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback